Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/26/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 01/26/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 01/26/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/26/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/02/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/16/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/16/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/16/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/02/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 03/02/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/17/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/17/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/02/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/02/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/22/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/27/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/10/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/22/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/22/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/09/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/09/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/09/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/30/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/30/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/30/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/30/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/07/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/07/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/19/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 10/19/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/19/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/15/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/15/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/09/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/04/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/11/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/11/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/04/1994