There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the formula for determining the Official Mail Allowance for Members, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/21/1993 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/21/1993 Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/1993 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/23/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/23/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/23/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/23/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/23/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/23/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/23/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/23/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/23/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/23/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3] 02/23/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/11/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/11/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/17/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/01/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/01/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/20/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/20/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/20/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/10/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/10/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/19/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 04/19/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/19/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/21/1993 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.549.

Subjects (5)

  • Congressional allowances
  • Franking privilege
  • House of Representatives
  • Postal rates and revenues

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.549. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/1993)

Amends the Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 1991 to change the Official Mail Allowance for Members of the House of Representatives to not more than the product of: (1) one and one-half times the single-piece rate applicable to first class mail (currently three times such rate); and (2) the number of addresses in the congressional district.