Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/10/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/17/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/17/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/17/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/17/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/17/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/17/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/30/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/28/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/28/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/28/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/28/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/28/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/12/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/26/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/26/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/22/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/22/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/04/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/04/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/04/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 09/28/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/14/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/11/1994