There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Downed Animal Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Packers and Stockyards Act, 1921, to make it unlawful for any stockyard owner, market agency, or dealer to transfer or market nonambulatory livestock, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/25/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/28/1994Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock
01/27/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
01/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/23/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/23/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/23/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/23/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/23/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/23/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/23/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/23/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/23/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/23/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/23/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/23/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/11/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 05/11/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/11/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/11/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/11/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/11/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/11/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/11/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 05/25/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/25/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/25/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/29/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/29/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/29/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/29/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/29/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/29/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/02/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/02/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 08/02/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/06/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/03/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/03/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/13/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 09/21/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/23/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/23/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/26/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1994
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/11/1993 08/05/1993 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture01/25/1993 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock01/27/1993 Referred to
09/28/1994 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.559. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/1993)

Downed Animal Protection Act - Amends the Packers and Stockyards Act, 1921 to make it unlawful for any stockyard owner, market agency, or dealer to market, transfer, or hold nonambulatory livestock that has not been humanely euthanized.