Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/03/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/01/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/11/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/11/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/17/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/12/1994