There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Property Protection Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure the Federal agencies establish the appropriate procedures for assessing whether or not Federal regulations might result in the taking of private property, and to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to report to the Congress with respect to such takings under programs of the Department of Agriculture.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/25/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
03/23/1994Subcommittee on Department Operations and Nutrition Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/23/1994Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations and Nutrition
11/03/1993Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations and Nutrition
02/10/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/28/1993Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
01/28/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations and Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
01/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/25/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/25/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/16/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/16/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/16/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/16/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/01/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/01/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/01/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/01/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/01/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/01/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/01/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/18/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/18/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/18/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/21/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/21/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/19/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/19/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/19/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/19/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/19/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/19/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/16/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/16/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/16/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/16/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/23/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/23/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/23/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/23/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/23/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/23/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/23/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 06/23/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/23/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/23/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/26/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/26/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 02/22/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/30/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 08/03/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture01/25/1993 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations and Nutrition01/28/1993 Referred to
11/03/1993 Hearings by
03/23/1994 Markup by
03/23/1994 Discharged from
House Judiciary01/25/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations02/10/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.561.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.561. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/1993)

Private Property Protection Act of 1993 - Prohibits any regulation issued by an executive agency after enactment of this Act from becoming effective until the issuing agency is certified by the Attorney General to be in compliance with Executive Order 12360 or similar procedures to assess the potential for the taking of private property in the course of Federal regulatory activity, with the goal of minimizing such takings where possible.

Provides for limited judicial review of an action taken pursuant to this Act.

Requires the Secretary of Agriculture to study and report to the Congress on the effect this Act will have on the farm economy and agricultural production.