Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/25/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/16/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/16/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/16/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/16/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/01/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/01/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/01/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/01/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/01/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/01/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/01/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/18/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/18/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/18/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/21/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/21/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/19/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/19/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/19/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/19/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/19/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/19/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/16/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/16/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/16/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/16/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/23/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/23/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/23/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/23/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/23/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/23/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/23/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 06/23/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/23/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/23/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/26/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/26/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 02/22/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/30/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 08/03/1994