Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/27/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 01/27/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/27/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 01/27/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/27/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/27/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/27/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/27/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/27/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/27/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/27/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/27/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/27/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/27/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/27/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 01/27/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/18/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/18/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/18/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/18/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 02/18/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/18/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/18/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/03/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/03/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/03/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/03/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/03/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/10/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 03/10/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/18/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/24/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/31/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/31/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/31/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/21/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/21/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/22/1993