Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 02/17/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/03/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/03/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/03/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/03/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/03/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/03/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/03/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/03/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/03/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/03/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/03/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/03/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/03/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/03/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/03/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/10/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/10/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/10/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 03/10/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/10/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/10/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/10/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/10/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/24/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/24/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/24/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 03/24/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/24/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/24/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/20/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/20/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/20/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/17/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/17/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/17/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 09/28/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/16/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/16/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/16/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 11/16/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/16/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/16/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/16/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/09/1994