Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/26/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/17/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/25/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/25/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/02/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/21/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/21/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/21/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/05/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/12/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/12/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/02/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/25/1994