Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/03/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/17/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/10/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/11/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/04/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/04/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/30/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/14/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/14/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/27/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/14/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 10/26/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/25/1994