Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/04/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/04/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/04/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/04/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/04/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/04/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/04/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/04/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/04/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 02/04/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/04/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/04/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/04/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/04/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/18/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/18/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/11/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/11/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/24/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/24/1993