Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/02/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/02/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/02/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/02/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/02/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/03/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/03/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/03/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/03/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/04/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/04/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/04/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 02/04/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/04/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/04/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/16/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/16/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/16/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/16/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/02/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/17/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 03/17/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/18/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/30/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 03/30/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/30/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/02/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/02/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/02/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/02/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/20/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/21/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/26/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/28/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/06/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/09/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/15/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/17/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/17/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/18/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/29/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/30/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/13/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/23/1993