Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/27/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/04/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/17/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/24/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/24/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/24/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/24/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/04/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/04/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/04/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/04/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/04/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/04/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/24/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/24/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/21/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/29/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/29/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/14/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/23/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/23/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/13/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/23/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 09/23/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 10/06/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/03/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/03/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/09/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/02/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/02/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/16/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/18/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/23/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 05/23/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/23/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/11/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/11/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/11/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/20/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/1994