Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/23/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/23/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/01/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/01/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/23/1994