Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/27/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/18/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/18/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/18/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/18/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/18/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/18/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/18/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/18/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 02/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/18/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/18/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/18/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/18/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/18/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 02/18/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/18/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/18/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/18/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/18/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 02/18/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/18/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 02/18/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/18/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/18/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/18/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/18/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/17/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/17/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/01/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/01/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/01/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/01/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/22/1993