Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/27/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/03/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/03/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/16/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/16/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/16/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/16/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/16/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/16/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/16/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/16/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/25/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/25/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/25/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/25/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/24/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/24/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/02/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/05/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/24/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/10/1993