Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/02/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/18/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/18/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/18/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/18/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/16/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/16/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/16/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/11/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/26/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew