Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/01/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/01/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/01/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/01/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/01/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/22/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/22/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 08/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/05/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 08/05/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/05/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 08/05/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/29/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/03/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/23/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/23/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 07/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 08/02/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/02/1994