Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/02/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/03/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/22/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/08/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/08/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/08/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/16/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/16/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/17/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/17/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/17/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/17/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/24/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/31/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/28/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/18/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/19/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/26/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/28/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/14/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/21/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/04/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/04/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/18/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/21/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/21/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/04/1994