There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Act entitled "An Act to provide for the extension of certain Federal benefits, services, and assistance to the Pascua Yaqui Indians of Arizona, and for other purposes".


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/14/1994Became Public Law No: 103-357.
10/14/1994Signed by President.
10/06/1994Presented to President.
10/03/1994Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
08/19/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S12208-12209)
08/16/1994Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment. With written report No. 103-338.
08/02/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H5632-5633)
08/02/1993Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-204.
02/02/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/14/1994Became Public Law No: 103-357.
10/14/1994Signed by President.
10/06/1994HousePresented to President.
10/03/1994-1:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/1994-1:44pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
10/03/1994-1:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/03/1994-1:35pmHouseMr. Richardson moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
08/23/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/19/1994SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S12208-12209)
08/16/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 575.
08/16/1994SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment. With written report No. 103-338.
04/13/1994SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/27/1994SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
08/03/1993SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
08/02/1993-4:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/02/1993-4:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H5632-5633)
08/02/1993-3:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/02/1993-3:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
08/02/1993-3:59pmHouseMr. Richardson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/1993HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-204.
08/02/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 115.
07/28/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/28/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/18/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
06/18/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
04/30/1993HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs
04/23/1993HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
02/18/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Native American Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/02/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/02/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E232)
02/02/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/02/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 02/02/1993

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/02/1993 Referred to
07/28/1993 Markup by
08/02/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-204
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs02/18/1993 Referred to
04/30/1993 Hearings by
06/18/1993 Markup by
06/18/1993 Reported by
Senate Indian Affairs (Permanent Select)08/03/1993 Referred to
01/27/1994 Hearings by
04/13/1994 Markup by
08/16/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-338

No related bill information was received for H.R.734.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.734. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/19/1994)

Extends: (1) Federal recognition to the Pasqua Yaqui Indians of Arizona (the Tribe) as an historic tribe; and (2) the enrollment deadline for all U.S. citizens of Yaqui blood who apply for enrollment in the Tribe within three years after enactment of this Act.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior, with tribal participation, to study the adequacy of the Tribe's land, water, and funding resources.

Authorizes appropriations.