Committees: H.R.734 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/02/1993 Referred to
07/28/1993 Markup by
08/02/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-204
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Native American Affairs02/18/1993 Referred to
04/30/1993 Hearings by
06/18/1993 Markup by
06/18/1993 Reported by
Senate Indian Affairs (Permanent Select)08/03/1993 Referred to
01/27/1994 Hearings by
04/13/1994 Markup by
08/16/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-338