Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/16/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/01/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/01/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/29/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/29/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/29/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/29/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/21/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/21/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/12/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/20/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/20/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/08/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 09/28/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/28/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/28/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/04/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 11/09/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 01/25/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/29/1994