Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/11/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/20/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/04/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/10/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/10/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/10/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/10/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/24/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/30/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/30/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/30/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 06/30/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/30/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/30/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/30/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/26/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/26/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/26/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/26/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/03/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/03/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/03/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 11/17/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/17/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/17/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/17/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/02/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/02/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/19/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/28/1994