Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/24/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/24/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/24/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/24/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/24/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 02/24/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/24/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/09/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 03/09/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/09/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/09/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/09/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/09/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/09/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/25/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/28/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/20/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 11/17/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/09/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/09/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/24/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 05/11/1994