Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/20/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/21/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 06/23/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/23/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/23/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/23/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/23/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/23/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/23/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 06/23/1994