There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Rates Codification Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Rates Codification Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to codify the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of such veterans as such rates took effect on December 1, 1992.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/13/1993Became Public Law No: 103-78.
08/13/1993Signed by President.
08/05/1993Presented to President.
08/02/1993Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H5559-5560)
07/28/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 970 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/28/1993Senate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/27/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
04/22/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 103-63.
02/03/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/13/1993Became Public Law No: 103-78.
08/13/1993Signed by President.
08/05/1993HousePresented to President.
08/02/1993-12:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/02/1993-12:28pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H5559-5560)
08/02/1993-12:26pmHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
07/29/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/28/1993SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 970 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/28/1993SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 970 amended.
07/28/1993SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9772-9773)
07/28/1993SenateSenate Committee on Veterans discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/28/1993SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
04/27/1993-1:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/27/1993-1:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
04/27/1993-1:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
04/27/1993-1:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2042-2045)
04/27/1993-1:00pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/22/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 31.
04/22/1993HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 103-63.
04/01/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/01/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/08/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/03/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/03/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (33)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/03/1993 Referred to
04/01/1993 Markup by
04/22/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-63
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance02/08/1993 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/28/1993 Referred to
07/28/1993 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.798. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/28/1993)

Increases the rates of: (1) veterans' disability compensation; (2) additional compensation for veterans' dependents; (3) the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans; (4) dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children; and (5) supplemental dependency and indemnity compensation for disabled adult children.

Makes a technical correction relating to the financing of discount points for certain veterans' loans.

Deletes the requirement that adjustments in adjustable rate mortgages guaranteed to veterans by the Department of Veterans Affairs occur on the anniversary of the date on which the loan was closed.