Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/03/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/04/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/04/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/04/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/16/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 02/16/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 02/16/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/16/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/18/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/16/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/16/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/16/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/16/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/25/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/22/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/28/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/28/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/28/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/24/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/24/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/26/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/09/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/22/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/22/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 07/01/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/22/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/04/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 08/04/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/23/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/29/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/20/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/08/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/28/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/28/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/10/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/11/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/12/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/09/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/26/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 07/29/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 08/10/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 08/18/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 09/20/1994