Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/27/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 05/27/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/27/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/27/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/27/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/27/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/27/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/27/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 05/27/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/27/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/27/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/27/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/27/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/27/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/27/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/27/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/27/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/27/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/27/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/27/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/06/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/06/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/19/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/26/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/26/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 05/26/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/26/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/26/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/26/1994