Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/04/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/24/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/24/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/23/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/23/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/23/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/23/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/23/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/23/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 03/23/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/31/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/31/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/31/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/31/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/31/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/31/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 05/05/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/26/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/26/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/26/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/26/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/30/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/30/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/15/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/22/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/22/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 09/22/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/26/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/26/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/26/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/01/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 08/01/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/01/1994