Committees: H.R.821 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/04/1993 Referred to
07/27/1993 Markup by
07/29/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-197
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs02/09/1993 Referred to
06/10/1993 Hearings by
07/22/1993 Markup by
07/22/1993 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/03/1993 Referred to
11/11/1993 Discharged from