Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/16/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/16/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/16/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/16/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/23/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/23/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/23/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/23/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/23/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/25/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/18/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew