Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 02/04/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/11/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/11/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/11/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/11/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/11/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/01/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/22/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/17/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 05/17/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/17/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/17/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/17/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/17/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/17/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/20/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/24/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/24/1993