Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/17/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/17/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/17/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/10/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/10/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/02/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/05/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/05/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/24/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/24/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/24/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/24/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/17/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/18/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/15/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/28/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/28/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/28/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/03/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/06/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/22/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/22/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/22/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/14/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/16/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/19/1994