Committees: H.R.881 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation02/16/1993 Referred to
06/17/1993 Markup by
10/15/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-298 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds02/22/1993 Referred to
04/22/1993 Hearings by
06/16/1993 Markup by
06/16/1993 Reported by
House Government Operations10/15/1993 Referred to
11/12/1993 Discharged from
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security10/25/1993 Referred to