Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/16/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/24/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/24/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/24/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/24/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/24/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/24/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/23/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/23/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 03/23/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/23/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/23/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/23/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/23/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/23/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/23/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/23/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/23/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/23/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/23/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/23/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/23/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/23/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/23/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/23/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/23/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/23/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/23/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/23/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/23/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/23/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/05/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/26/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/15/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/15/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/22/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/22/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/22/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/05/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/22/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/22/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/18/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/18/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/18/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/21/1994