Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/17/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/17/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/17/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/17/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/17/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/17/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/17/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/17/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/17/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/17/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/31/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/31/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/31/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/31/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/31/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/31/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 07/23/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/03/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/03/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/09/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/09/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/09/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 02/09/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/09/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/11/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 02/23/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 02/23/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/24/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/24/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/01/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/01/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/01/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/21/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/14/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/21/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/28/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/28/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/11/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/23/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/03/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/29/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/07/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/07/1994