Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/18/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/18/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/29/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/29/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/30/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/30/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/01/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/01/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/22/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/27/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/20/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/12/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/12/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/19/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/08/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/07/1994