There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Air Force Memorial Foundation to establish a memorial in the District of Columbia or its environs.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/02/1993Became Public Law No: 103-163.
12/02/1993Signed by President.
11/23/1993Presented to President.
11/20/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S16893)
11/16/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
02/16/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/02/1993Became Public Law No: 103-163.
12/02/1993Signed by President.
11/23/1993HousePresented to President.
11/22/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S16893)
11/18/1993SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
11/16/1993-2:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/1993-2:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
11/16/1993-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/16/1993-2:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9737-9739)
11/16/1993-2:21pmHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/03/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
11/03/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
02/17/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
02/16/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
02/16/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/25/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/25/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/25/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/25/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/25/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/25/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/25/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 03/25/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/25/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/25/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/25/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/26/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/26/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/26/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/26/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/26/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 09/08/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/22/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/22/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/22/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/22/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/22/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/22/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/22/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/08/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/16/1993 Referred to
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials02/17/1993 Referred to
11/03/1993 Markup by
11/03/1993 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.898. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/1993)

Authorizes the Air Force Memorial Foundation to establish a memorial on Federal land in the District of Columbia or its environs to honor the men and women who have served in the U.S. Air Force.