Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/25/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/25/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/25/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/25/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/25/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/25/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/25/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 03/25/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/25/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/25/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/25/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/26/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/26/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/26/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/26/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/26/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 09/08/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/22/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/22/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/22/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/22/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/22/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/22/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/22/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/08/1993