Summary: H.R.920 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/03/1993)

Emergency Unemployment Compensation Amendments of 1993 - Amends the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Act of 1991 (Public Law 102-164, as amended) to extend the authorization for new claims for benefits under the emergency unemployment compensation (EUC) program to October 2, 1993 (currently March 6, 1993). Modifies the final phase-out period for continuation of claims to end it on January 15, 1994 (currently June 19, 1993).

Provides for a similar extension of the program of temporary extended railroad unemployment insurance benefits (and modification of the phase-out period).

Directs the Secretary of Labor to establish a program to encourage all States to adopt and implement a system (including automated data processing) for profiling all new claimants for regular unemployment compensation, to determine which claimants may be likely to exhaust such compensation and need reemployment assistance services. Requires provision of such technical assistance, advice, and funding to States for model profiling systems as the Secretary deems appropriate and necessary. Requires the Secretary to report, with recommendations, to the Congress on such systems within 30 months after enactment of this Act.

Authorizes appropriations and the use of advance account funds to carry out the extension of the EUC program. Designates all direct spending amounts provided and all appropriations authorized by this Act as emergency requirements for purposes of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act).

Eliminates a cost of living adjustment relating to the pay for Members of Congress for 1994.