Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/02/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/02/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 02/02/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/02/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/02/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/02/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/02/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/02/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/02/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/17/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/17/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/17/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/17/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/17/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/17/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/17/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/10/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/17/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/17/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/17/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/17/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/17/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/17/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/17/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/17/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/30/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/14/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 07/14/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/14/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 08/05/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/05/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/05/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/13/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/13/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/13/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/13/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/13/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/09/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/09/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/09/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 11/09/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/09/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/09/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/09/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/09/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/09/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/09/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/09/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 11/16/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 11/16/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/16/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 11/16/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/16/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/16/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 11/16/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/16/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/16/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/16/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/16/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/16/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/16/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/16/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/16/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/16/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 11/16/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 11/16/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/16/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 11/16/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 11/16/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 11/16/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/16/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 11/16/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/16/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 11/16/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/16/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/20/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/20/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/20/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/26/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 01/26/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/02/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/02/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/02/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 02/24/1994