Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/17/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/10/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 06/16/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/16/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/18/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 06/29/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/29/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/29/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/21/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/04/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/04/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/04/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/06/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/28/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew