Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/26/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/18/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 07/27/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/27/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/03/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/06/1993