Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/11/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/11/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/11/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/11/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/11/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/11/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/11/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/29/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/29/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/29/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/29/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/29/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 03/29/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/29/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 05/05/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 05/05/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/05/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/05/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/05/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/05/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/05/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/05/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/20/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/20/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/20/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/20/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/09/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/09/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/09/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/09/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/09/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/09/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/26/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 07/26/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 07/29/1994