Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/18/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/04/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/04/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/04/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/04/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/04/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/04/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/04/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/18/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/18/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/18/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/18/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/18/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/18/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/18/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/18/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/25/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/25/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 03/25/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/25/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/31/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/31/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/31/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/31/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/31/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/31/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/31/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/31/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/19/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/19/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/19/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/19/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/19/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/19/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/19/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/19/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/19/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/19/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/05/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/05/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/19/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/27/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/27/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/15/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/15/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/18/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 07/01/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 07/01/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 07/01/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/01/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/19/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/19/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/23/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/23/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/23/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/30/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/30/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 08/06/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/15/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/15/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/15/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/06/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/06/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/14/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 10/14/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/14/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/14/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/14/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/03/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/19/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 03/16/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/12/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/26/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/02/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/02/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 08/02/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/02/1994