Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/08/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/08/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/08/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/08/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/08/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/08/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/08/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/08/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/08/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/08/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/08/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/08/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/08/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/08/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/08/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/08/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/08/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/08/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/10/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/10/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/16/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/16/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/16/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/01/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/01/1993