Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/02/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/02/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/02/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/02/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/02/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/02/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/03/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/09/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/09/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/09/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/09/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/09/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/09/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/10/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/10/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/11/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/24/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/24/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/29/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/29/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/31/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/31/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/07/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 04/07/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/21/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/29/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 05/11/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/20/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/14/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/23/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/28/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew