Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/23/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/23/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/23/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 06/23/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/23/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/23/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/23/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/23/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/23/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/13/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/13/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/13/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/15/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/03/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 08/03/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 08/03/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/03/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 08/03/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/03/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 08/03/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 08/03/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 08/03/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/08/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/08/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 09/08/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/08/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/09/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/09/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/09/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/09/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/09/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/09/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/09/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/09/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/09/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/09/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/09/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/09/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/09/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/21/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/21/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/21/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/21/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/21/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 09/21/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/30/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 09/30/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/30/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/30/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/30/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/30/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 09/30/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/06/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/14/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/28/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/28/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/28/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/28/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/09/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 11/09/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/10/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/10/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/10/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/16/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/17/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 11/17/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/18/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/02/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/02/1994