Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/15/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/15/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/26/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/26/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/26/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/15/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/15/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/15/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/15/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/15/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/15/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/06/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/06/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/06/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 10/19/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/19/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/19/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/19/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/19/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/19/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/26/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 10/26/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/26/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/26/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/26/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/26/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/26/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/10/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/10/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 11/10/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/10/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/10/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/10/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/21/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/21/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/21/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/08/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/08/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/08/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/01/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/01/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/22/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/22/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/25/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/13/1994